Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomaz da Encarnação da Costa e Lima, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olinda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1723BornBahia
1 May 174824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
18 Apr 177450.8AppointedBishop of Olinda, Brazil
29 May 177450.9Ordained BishopBishop of Olinda, Brazil
14 Jan 178460.5DiedBishop of Olinda, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tomaz da Encarnação da Costa e Lima:
Bishop Tomaz da Encarnação da Costa e Lima C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Olinda

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015