Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon Lesambo Ndamwize

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1929Born
21 Jul 195627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
12 Jun 196737.9AppointedBishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Oct 196738.3Ordained BishopBishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Jul 200576.0RetiredBishop of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Nov 201788.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Inongo, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Léon Lesambo Ndamwize
Bishop Léon Lesambo Ndamwize (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Inongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMushie, Vicariate Apostolic of Inongo
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Inongo, Diocese of Inongo
Death PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Albert, Cathedral, Inongo, Diocese of Inongo

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 50.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2005
  • d: Annuario Pontificio Variazioni, Year 2020, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Jul 2020

Quantcast