Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Onyembo Lomandjo, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1931Born
27 Jul 195827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
17 May 196634.8AppointedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Dec 196635.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
17 Jan 197846.5ResignedBishop of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Jan 201684.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Kindu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Albert Onyembo Lomandjo
Bishop Albert Onyembo Lomandjo C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kindu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKindu

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast