Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Delegation to Western Africa

Africae Occidentalis

Territory Lost

To: Delegation to Mauritania



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Dakar
1948ErectedDelegation to Dakar (erected)
Delegation to Western Africa
23 September 1960Name ChangedDelegation to Dakar Delegation to Western Africa
28 December 1961Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Nunciature to Sénégal (erected)
1971Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Nunciature to Niger (erected)
1972Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Nunciature to Dahomey (erected)
1972Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Nunciature to Côte d’Ivoire (erected)
1973Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Delegation to Togo (erected)
1973Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Delegation to Ghana (erected)
1973Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Nunciature to Guinea (erected)
1973SuppressedDelegation to Western Africa (suppressed)
17 October 1973Territory LostDelegation to Western Africa Delegation to Mauritania (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.6, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Aug 2016