Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioseph (Songolo) Mulolwa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kalemie-Kirungu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1917BornMisembe
29 Sep 194629.5Ordained PriestPriest of Baudouinville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Sep 196649.5AppointedBishop of Baudouinville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
9 Apr 196750.1Ordained BishopBishop of Baudouinville, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
11 Nov 197861.6ResignedBishop of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
21 Jul 197962.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kalemie-Kirungu, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Ioseph (Songolo) Mulolwa:
Bishop Ioseph (Songolo) Mulolwa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kalemie-Kirungu

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013