Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin Fataki Alueke

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kisangani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1912BornMahagi
1 Oct 194432.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 196755.7AppointedArchbishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
28 Jan 196856.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
1 Sep 198876.6RetiredArchbishop of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Dec 199987.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kisangani, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Augustin Fataki Alueke:
Archbishop Augustin Fataki Alueke (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kisangani

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015