Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Massimiliani

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1905BornFalerone
8 Dec 192722.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 194843.1AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
15 Aug 194843.2Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy
19 Jun 197570.1DiedBishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Massimiliani:
Bishop Roberto Massimiliani (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana, Orte e Gallese

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013