Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ravagli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Modigliana

Titular Bishop of Montecorvino

Auxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1907BornPortico di Romagna
11 Aug 192922.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jul 195548.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Larino, Italy
4 Jul 195548.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
11 Sep 195548.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Arabia
12 Mar 195952.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Modigliana, Italy
30 Aug 196053.6SucceededBishop of Modigliana, Italy
1968¹60.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Faenza, Italy
30 Apr 197063.2ResignedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
30 Apr 197063.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
30 Apr 197063.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Montecorvino
14 Dec 198174.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Modigliana, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ravagli:
Bishop Antonio Ravagli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Modigliana

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015