Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Carinci

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1862Born
19 Dec 188523.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 193067.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
15 Dec 194583.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
6 Jan 194683.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
5 Jan 196097.1RetiredSecretary of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
5 Dec 1963101.0DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Carinci (VIAF: 88669117)
Archbishop Alfonso Carinci (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of (Sacred) Rites

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 77.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 1
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 May 2018

Quantcast