Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Otmar Mäder

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1921Born
22 Mar 194725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
23 Mar 197654.3SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
25 Mar 197654.3ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
2 May 197654.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
24 Sep 199472.8RetiredBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
25 Apr 200381.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Otmar Mäder
Bishop Otmar Mäder (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMörschwil

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast