Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hasler

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1900BornAltstätten
20 Mar 192625.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
16 Apr 195756.9SelectedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
18 Apr 195756.9ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
26 May 195757.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
24 Mar 197675.9RetiredBishop of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
20 Dec 198585.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hasler:
Bishop Joseph Hasler (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Gallen

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015