Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Nestor Adam, C.R.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1903BornEtroubles
192016.9ProfessedMember of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
28 Aug 192724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Hospitaller Congregation of Great Saint Bernard
8 Aug 195249.5AppointedBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
12 Oct 195249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
22 Jul 197774.5RetiredBishop of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland
8 Feb 199087.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for François-Nestor Adam:
Bishop François-Nestor Adam C.R.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sion {Sitten}

  • a priest for 62.4 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013