Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop István Madarász

Deceased

Bishop of Košice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1884BornNagyszombat / Trnava, Slovakia
3 Jan 190722.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 193955.0AppointedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
24 Aug 193955.1Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
8 Aug 194864.1DiedBishop of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for István Madarász:
Bishop István Madarász (born , died ) Bishop of Košice

  • a priest for 41.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013