Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Apollonio Maggio

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Piceno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1859BornSpessa di Cologna Veneta
28 Mar 188424.4Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
31 Jan 191050.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
12 Mar 191050.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
4 Apr 191050.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
13 May 191050.5AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
22 Oct 192767.9DiedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Apollonio Maggio:
Bishop Apollonio Maggio (born , died ) Bishop of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1928
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013