Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Sogaro, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Amida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1839BornLonigo, Italy
22 Sep 188242.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
10 Jul 188545.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
2 Aug 188545.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
10 Jun 1894³54.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Central Africa {Africa Centrale}, Sudan
21 Aug 189454.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amida
1 May 190060.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
26 Oct 190363.8AppointedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia
6 Feb 191272.1DiedPresident of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy, Roman Curia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sogaro:
Archbishop Francesco Sogaro F.S.C.J. (born , died ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 95, and Page 562
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,315

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014