Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni FossÓ

Deceased

Bishop of Fiesole, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1853Born
8 Aug 187522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
29 Apr 190956.2AppointedBishop of Fiesole, Italy
27 Jun 190956.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fiesole, Italy
17 Dec 193683.9DiedBishop of Fiesole, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni FossÓ
Bishop Giovanni FossÓ (born , died ) Bishop of Fiesole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGambellara
Ordained BishopLonigo

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1909, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,905

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 19 Apr 2020

Quantcast