Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Jeremich

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}

Titular Bishop of Berissa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1875BornVenezia
25 Jul 189722.6Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
31 May 192954.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
31 May 192954.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
25 Jul 192954.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berissa
23 Oct 194873.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Jeremich:
Bishop Giovanni Jeremich (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013