Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Edward Likowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1836Born
21 Dec 186125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
17 Mar 188750.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
17 Mar 188750.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
1 May 188750.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
13 Aug 191477.8AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
21 Sep 191477.9InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
20 Feb 191578.4DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Edward Likowski (VIAF: 12674623)
Archbishop Edward Likowski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWrześnia, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
Ordained BishopPoznań, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,584
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017