Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduard Herrmann (Hermann)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Titular Bishop of Cybistra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1836Born
24 Jul 185922.6Ordained PriestPriest of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
30 Aug 190164.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
30 Aug 190164.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cybistra
24 Nov 190164.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cybistra
3 Mar 191679.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

MicroData Summary for Eduard Herrmann (Hermann)
Bishop Eduard Herrmann (Hermann) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchönfelde
Ordained BishopFrauenburg

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,398
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 68
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast