Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jakob Klunder

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Titular Bishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1849Born
15 Apr 187626.7Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
6 Jul 190757.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
6 Jul 190757.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Selymbria
15 Sep 190758.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selymbria
21 Sep 192778.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jakob Klunder
Bishop Jakob Klunder (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoślinka

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast