Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Andrzejewicz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Philomelium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1837Born
2 Jun 186023.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
8 Jul 186023.1Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
23 Jun 189053.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
23 Jun 189053.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Philomelium
3 Aug 189053.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philomelium
15 Sep 190770.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Andrzejewicz (VIAF: 315119516)
Bishop Antoni Andrzejewicz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKotowiecko, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017