Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Florian Oksza von Stablewski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1841Born
23 Dec 186524.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
24 Feb 186624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
14 Dec 189150.1AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
17 Jan 189250.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
24 Nov 190665.1DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Florian Oksza von Stablewski (VIAF: 25373299)
Archbishop Florian Oksza von Stablewski (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFraustadt
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral Basilica, Gniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,588
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 287
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 May 2017