Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Antoni Trepnau

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Titular Bishop of Flavias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1835Born
27 Jun 185823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
3 Oct 190570.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
3 Oct 190570.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
10 Dec 190570.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
16 Jun 190670.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Antoni Trepnau
Bishop Jan Antoni Trepnau (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBobowo

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,395
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast