Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Julius Josephus Dinder

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1830BornRößel
8 Jun 185626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
2 Mar 188656.0AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
30 May 188656.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
30 May 189060.2DiedArchbishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Julius Josephus Dinder:
Archbishop Julius Josephus Dinder (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 287

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013