Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philipp Cardinal Krementz

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1819BornKoblenz
27 Aug 184222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
22 Oct 186747.9SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
20 Dec 186748.1ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
3 May 186848.4Ordained BishopBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
30 Jul 188565.7AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
15 Dec 188566.0InstalledArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 Jan 189373.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 189373.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
6 May 189979.4DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Philipp Krementz:
Cardinal Philipp Krementz (born , died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
  • a cardinal for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 215, and Page 583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Jan 1893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013