Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustyn Rosentreter

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1844Born
12 Mar 187026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
22 Dec 189854.9SelectedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
27 Feb 189955.1ConfirmedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
9 Jul 189955.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
4 Oct 192682.7DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Augustyn Rosentreter (VIAF: 60278992)
Bishop Augustyn Rosentreter (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbrau, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pelplin, Diocese of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 233
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017