Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ireneusz Józef Pękalski

Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

Titular Bishop of Castellum Tingitii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1950 BornTomaszów Mazowiecki
2 Jun 197424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Łódź, Poland
11 Dec 199949.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
11 Dec 199949.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Tingitii
8 Jan 200049.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Tingitii

MicroData Summary for Ireneusz Józef Pękalski:
Bishop Ireneusz Józef Pękalski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łódź

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Łódź.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,679

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Feb 2014