Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan-Wawrzyniec Kulik

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łódź

Titular Bishop of Rhandus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1918BornMilejów
3 Jun 194526.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 195941.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
15 Jul 195941.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhandus
4 Oct 195941.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhandus
10 Jul 199375.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Łódź, Poland
27 Oct 199577.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łódź, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan-Wawrzyniec Kulik:
Bishop Jan-Wawrzyniec Kulik (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Łódź

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 May 2014