Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bissau

Dioecesis Bissagensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Câmnate na Bissign, Bishop
  • José Lampra Cà, Auxiliary Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 21 March 1977
  • Immediately Subject to the Holy See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Guinea-Bissau
  • Square Kilometers: 11,490 (4,438 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: C.P. 20, Av. 14 de Novembro 48, 1001 Bissau CODEX, Guine-Bissau
  • Telephone: 25.10.57
  • Fax: 25.10.58

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Guinea Portoghese
4 September 1940ErectedDiocese of Santiago de Cabo Verde Mission "Sui Iuris" of Guinea Portoghese (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea Portoghese
29 April 1955ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Guinea Portoghese Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea Portoghese
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea-Bissau
1 January 1975Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Guinea Portoghese Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea-Bissau
Diocese of Bissau
21 March 1977ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Guinea-Bissau Diocese of Bissau
13 March 2001Territory LostDiocese of Bissau Diocese of Bafatá (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Guinea Portoghese
19508,139359,1242.3%117184527126ap1951
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea Portoghese
197029,007559,5605.2%28281,035382315ap1971
Prefecture Apostolic of Guinea-Bissau
Diocese of Bissau
198045,300560,0008.1%37371,224482213ap1981
199066,000969,0006.8%250521,2691677927ap1991
1999135,2521,040,40013.0%1352652,0806612329ap2000
2000138,0001,060,80013.0%1255672,0596812929ap2001
2001105,000650,00016.2%941502,100515313ap2002
2002110,6001,082,00010.2%1058681,6267311020ap2003
2003120,0001,200,00010.0%1254661,8187010225ap2004
200489,000810,00011.0%748551,6186910124ap2005
200695,000845,00011.2%1149601,583689924ap2007
2012166,0001,055,00015.7%1865832,00018511926ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013