Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Bernard Thompson

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Charleston, South Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1923Born
27 May 195026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Jan 196137.6IncardinatedPriest of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Apr 198965.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
24 May 198965.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
22 Feb 199066.7SucceededBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
12 Jul 199976.1ResignedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
24 Nov 201390.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for David Bernard Thompson
Bishop David Bernard Thompson (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,250
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 Nov 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast