Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laszlo Anthony Iranyi, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Castellum Medianum

Titular See: (Hungarians outside Hungary)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1923BornSzeged, Hungary
13 Mar 194824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
20 May 198360.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
27 Jul 198360.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
6 Mar 198763.9DiedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum

MicroData Summary for Laszlo Anthony Iranyi:
Bishop Laszlo Anthony Iranyi Sch. P. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Castellum Medianum

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013