Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Joseph O’Connell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palm Beach, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1938BornLisheen, Ireland
30 Mar 196324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Jefferson City, Missouri, USA
27 May 198850.0AppointedBishop of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA
8 Sep 198850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA
12 Nov 199860.5AppointedBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
14 Jan 199960.7InstalledBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
13 Mar 200263.8ResignedBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
4 May 201274.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Palm Beach, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Joseph O’Connell:
Bishop Anthony Joseph O’Connell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palm Beach

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,731
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: CB, 8 May 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013