Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William John Waltersheid

Auxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of California


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1956 BornAshland, PA
30 Apr 199235.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Jul 199235.6Ordained PriestPriest of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Feb 201154.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Feb 201154.3AppointedTitular Bishop of California
25 Apr 201154.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of California

MicroData Summary for William John Waltersheid:
Bishop William John Waltersheid (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pittsburgh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,041

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013