Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Richard Keating

Deceased

Bishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1934Born
20 Dec 195824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
7 Jun 198348.8AppointedBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA
4 Aug 198349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA
22 Mar 199863.6DiedBishop of Arlington, Virginia, USA

MicroData Summary for John Richard Keating (VIAF: 56176581)
Bishop John Richard Keating (born , died ) Bishop of Arlington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago, Archdiocese of Chicago, Illinois
Ordained BishopCathedral, Arlington, Diocese of Arlington, Virginia

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,544

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast