Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Novak, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Quilmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1928BornSan Miguel Arcángel
10 Jan 195425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
7 Aug 197648.5AppointedBishop of Quilmes, Argentina
19 Sep 197648.6Ordained BishopBishop of Quilmes, Argentina
9 Jul 200173.4DiedBishop of Quilmes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Novak:
Bishop Jorge Novak S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Quilmes

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013