Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Napoléon-Alexandre Labrie, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1893Born
15 Apr 192228.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
30 Mar 193844.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
30 Mar 193844.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
17 Jul 193844.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Limata
22 Dec 194552.3AppointedBishop of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
1 Dec 195663.3ResignedBishop of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada
1 Dec 195663.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hilta
23 Nov 197077.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Hilta
16 May 197379.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Napoléon-Alexandre Labrie
Bishop Napoléon-Alexandre Labrie C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Golfe St-Laurent

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGodbout

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast