Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Louis Scheerer, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Multan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1909BornPhiladelphia, PA, USA
13 Jun 193526.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Apr 196051.2AppointedBishop of Multan, Pakistan
8 May 196051.2Ordained BishopBishop of Multan, Pakistan
27 Jan 196657.0DiedBishop of Multan, Pakistan

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Louis Scheerer:
Bishop Aloysius Louis Scheerer O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Multan

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013