Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Albert Bray, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1883Born
29 Jun 191228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
18 Mar 193652.6AppointedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
21 May 193652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
17 Jun 195369.9DiedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Patrick Albert Bray
Bishop Patrick Albert Bray C.I.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint John, New Brunswick

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUpper Springfield

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast