Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebius John Crawford, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gizo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1917BornWarrenpoint, Ireland
29 Mar 194123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Mar 196042.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Solomon Islands, Solomon Islands
1 Mar 196042.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Caffa
8 May 196042.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caffa
15 Nov 196648.9AppointedBishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands
3 Feb 199577.2RetiredBishop of Gizo, Solomon Islands
31 May 200284.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Gizo, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Eusebius John Crawford:
Bishop Eusebius John Crawford O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gizo

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1960, Number 48
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Sep 2014