Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mikararanga Busimba

Deceased

Bishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1912²Born
15 Aug 194028.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 196048.1AppointedBishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
8 May 196048.3Ordained BishopBishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
7 Sep 197462.6DiedBishop of Goma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mikararanga Busimba
Bishop Joseph Mikararanga Busimba (born 1912, died ) Bishop of Goma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRutshuru

  • a priest for 34.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast