Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas William Muldoon

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia

Titular Bishop of Fesseë


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1917Born
22 Dec 194124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lismore, Australia
1 Mar 196042.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
1 Mar 196042.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Fesseë
8 May 196042.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fesseë
6 Sep 198264.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sydney, Australia
13 Jan 198668.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney, Australia

MicroData Summary for Thomas William Muldoon
Bishop Thomas William Muldoon (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sydney

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLismore

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast