Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Kuchmiak, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Great Britain (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Agathopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1923Born
3 Oct 194825.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 May 195633.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Feb 198865.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
27 Feb 198865.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
27 Apr 198865.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
24 Jun 198966.3AppointedApostolic Exarch of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
5 Apr 200279.1RetiredApostolic Exarch of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
26 Aug 200885.5DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of Great Britain (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Michael Kuchmiak
Bishop Michael Kuchmiak C.SS.R. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Great Britain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObertyn, Eparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Ordained PriestMeadowvale, Ontario, Apostolic Exarchate of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Philadelphia, PA, Archeparchy of Philadelphia (Ukrainian), Pennsylvania, USA
Death PlaceSaskatoon, Saskatchewan, Eparchy of Saskatoon (Ukrainian), Canada
Buried Place (Original)Holy Family, Cemetery, Winnipeg, Manitoba, Archeparchy of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,626
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • c1/prof: CB, 12 Jan 2015
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast