Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocent Hilarion Lotocky, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1915Born
20 Jun 193418.6ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 Aug 193721.7Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
24 Nov 194025.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
22 Dec 198065.1AppointedBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
1 Mar 198165.3Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
2 Jul 199377.6RetiredBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA
4 Jul 201397.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Innocent Hilarion Lotocky
Bishop Innocent Hilarion Lotocky O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Nicholas of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetlykiwci Stari, Ukraine

  • a priest for 72.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 4 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • c1/prof: CB, 12 Jan 2015
  • prof: CB, 25 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018