Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Piotr Stepa

Deceased

Bishop of Tarnów, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1892Born
27 Jun 191523.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Mar 194653.7AppointedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
19 May 194653.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
28 May 195966.9DiedBishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Piotr Stepa
Bishop Jan Piotr Stepa (born , died ) Bishop of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSasów

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast