Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roman Andrzejewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Tullia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1938BornMorzyczyn
21 May 196123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
12 Nov 198143.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
12 Nov 198143.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Tullia
20 Dec 198143.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tullia
7 Jul 200365.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Roman Andrzejewski:
Bishop Roman Andrzejewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Feb 2014