Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adalbert Endert

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1850Born
6 Apr 187322.2Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
18 Jul 189847.5SelectedBishop of Fulda, Germany
31 Aug 189847.6ConfirmedBishop of Fulda, Germany
28 Oct 189847.8Ordained BishopBishop of Fulda, Germany
17 Jul 190655.5DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adalbert Endert (VIAF: 316388770)
Bishop Adalbert Endert (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSetzelbach, Diocese of Fulda
Ordained BishopFulda, Diocese of Fulda

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 277
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017