Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Vollmar

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

Titular Bishop of Pergamum

Note/Previous Titular See: (vica/Prussia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1839BornPaderborn
15 Aug 186324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
9 Nov 190364.5AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
9 Nov 190364.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
10 Feb 190464.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
1913²73.6ResignedBishop of Germany, Military
8 Jul 191576.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Vollmar:
Bishop Heinrich Vollmar (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Germany, Military

  • a priest for 51.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015