Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Baptist Maria Assmann

Deceased

Bishop of Germany, Military

Titular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia

Note/Previous Titular See: (Prussia Military)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1833BornBranitz
15 Jul 186026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
1 Jun 188854.8AppointedBishop of Germany, Military
1 Jun 188854.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
15 Oct 188855.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
27 May 190369.8DiedBishop of Germany, Military

MicroData Summary for Johann Baptist Maria Assmann:
Bishop Johann Baptist Maria Assmann (born , died ) Bishop of Germany, Military

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013