Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Gregory Campbell, O.S.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Lancaster, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1941 Born
17 Sep 196624.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
16 Sep 197129.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
12 Feb 200866.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 200866.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
1 May 200967.5SucceededBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
12 Feb 201876.3RetiredBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael Gregory Campbell (VIAF: 12103535)
Bishop Michael Gregory Campbell O.S.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lancaster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLarne, County Antrim, Northern Ireland, Diocese of Down and Connor, Ireland
Ordained PriestAustin Friars School, Chapel, Carlisle, Cumbria, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Cathedral, Lancaster, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lancaster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2008
  • ob: CB
  • s: Bollettino, 2 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,700
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2018
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast