Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Terence Patrick Drainey

Bishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1949 Born
12 Jul 197525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salford, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 200758.2AppointedBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain
25 Jan 200858.4Ordained BishopBishop of Middlesbrough, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Terence Patrick Drainey
Bishop Terence Patrick Drainey (born ) Bishop of Middlesbrough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDroylesden, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained PriestSt. Anne, Church, Higher Openshaw, Manchester, Lancashire, Diocese of Salford, England
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Coulby Newham, Middlesbrough, Cleveland, Diocese of Middlesbrough, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Middlesbrough.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2007
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,664
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast